PDA

View Full Version : I HATE MATHS....MATHS STUNNER FOR ALL.......



darani
09-15-2008, 10:46 PM
Hi frnds this post will contain few tricks tat can be found in maths....

All can c dis tricks and njoy....Plz do understand y i hate maths.....

Hope u like dis post....U can also put in ur ideas here in maths.....

have a gr8 day
bye tc

darani
09-15-2008, 10:47 PM
Power of 2002

2,002 * 4 = 8,008
2,002 * 37 = 74,074
2,002 * 98 = 196,196
2,002 * 123 = 246,246
2,002 * 444 = 888,888
2,002 * 555 = 1,111,110

darani
09-15-2008, 10:48 PM
Incidentally, 2,002 is the product of a nice list of prime numbers: 2, 7, 11, and 13.

darani
09-15-2008, 10:51 PM
1 * 1 = 1
11 * 11 = 121
111 * 111 = 12,321
1,111* 1,111 = 1,234,321
11,111* 11,111 = 123,454,321
111,111 * 111,111 = 12,345,654,321
1,111,111 * 1,111,111 = 1,234,567,654,321
11,111,111 * 11,111,111 = 123,456,787,654,321
111,111,111 * 111,111,111 = 12,345,678,987,654,321

darani
09-15-2008, 10:53 PM
1 * 8 + 1 = 9
12 * 8 + 2 = 98
123 * 8 + 3 = 987
1,234 * 8 + 4 = 9,876
12,345 * 8 + 5 = 98,765
123,456 * 8 + 6 = 987,654
1,234,567 * 8 + 7 = 9,876,543
12,345,678 * 8 + 8 = 98,765,432
123,456,789 * 8 + 9 = 987,654,321

darani
09-15-2008, 10:54 PM
76,923 * 1 = 076,923
76,923 * 10 = 769,230
76,923 * 9 = 692,307
76,923 * 12 = 923,076
76,923 * 3 = 230,769
76,923 * 4 = 307,692

darani
09-15-2008, 10:55 PM
76,923 * 2 = 153,846
76,923 * 7 = 538,461
76,923 * 5 = 384,615
76,923 * 11 = 846,153
76,923 * 6 = 461,538
76,923 * 8 = 615,384

darani
09-15-2008, 10:56 PM
142,857 * 2 = 285,714
142,857 * 3 = 428,571
142,857 * 4 = 571,428
142,857 * 5 = 714,285
142,857 * 6 = 857,142

darani
09-15-2008, 10:57 PM
142,857 * 7 = 999,999

darani
09-15-2008, 10:58 PM
142,857 * 8 = 1,142,856

Can u c wat i can c?????????????

If we remove the millions digit and add it to the units digit, the original number is formed.

jojo_patty
09-17-2008, 05:50 PM
Very interesting....thanks for the share.

darani
09-18-2008, 02:07 PM
thnx jojo....

darani
09-25-2008, 02:12 PM
Well this is a poll to know hw many luv maths and hw many hate maths.....

lets c........

sunnyajmal
09-25-2008, 02:24 PM
I love maths.........

Haily
09-25-2008, 02:31 PM
i love chem and physics

sunnyajmal
09-25-2008, 02:36 PM
u have to vote yar..

Haily
09-25-2008, 02:36 PM
but i like em both..

by the way darani why did wrote an "s" with math..

sunnyajmal
09-25-2008, 02:41 PM
no problem yar... the world is still in its place...lolz

Haily
09-25-2008, 02:41 PM
lolzzz

sunnyajmal
09-25-2008, 02:45 PM
what lolzzzzz?

Haily
09-25-2008, 02:45 PM
it means im smiling or laughing..why do u ask..

lol=laugh out loud

sunnyajmal
09-25-2008, 02:52 PM
hmmmm......so u were laughing i thought u r crying.....lol

Haily
09-25-2008, 02:55 PM
no ajmal i was laughing..sadly ur thoughts were wrong..hehe

sunnyajmal
09-25-2008, 02:57 PM
oh i c....

darani
09-27-2008, 12:56 PM
12345679 * 9 = 111,111,111
12345679 * 18 = 222,222,222
12345679 * 27 = 333,333,333
12345679 * 36 = 444,444,444
12345679 * 45 = 555,555,555
12345679 * 54 = 666,666,666
12345679 * 63 = 777,777,777
12345679 * 72 = 888,888,888
12345679 * 81 = 999,999,999

darani
09-27-2008, 12:57 PM
In the following pattern chart, notice that the first and last digits of the
products are the digits of the multiples of 9.

987654321 * 9 = 08 888 888 889
987654321 * 18 = 17 777 777 778
987654321 * 27 = 26 666 666 667
987654321 * 36 = 35 555 555 556
987654321 * 45 = 44 444 444 445
987654321 * 54 = 53 333 333 334
987654321 * 63 = 62 222 222 223
987654321 * 72 = 71 111 111 112
987654321 * 81 = 80 000 000 001

darani
09-27-2008, 12:58 PM
0 * 9 + 1 = 1
1 * 9 + 2 = 11
12 * 9 + 3 = 111
123 * 9 + 4 = 1,111
1,234 * 9 + 5 = 11,111
12,345 * 9 + 6 = 111,111
123,456 * 9 + 7 = 1,111,111
1,234,567 * 9 + 8 = 11,111,111
12,345,678 * 9 + 9 = 111,111,111

darani
09-27-2008, 01:00 PM
0 * 9 + 8 = 8
9 * 9 + 7 = 88
98 * 9 + 6 = 888
987 * 9 + 5 = 8,888
9,876 * 9 + 4 = 88,888
98,765 * 9 + 3 = 888,888
987,654 * 9 + 2 = 8,888,888
9,876,543 * 9 + 1 = 88,888,888
98,765,432 * 9 + 0 = 888,888,888

darani
09-27-2008, 01:01 PM
987 * 1,001 = 987,987

darani
09-27-2008, 01:03 PM
Any six-digit number composed of two repeating sequences of three digits is divisible by 7, 11, and 13. For example,

643,643 / 7 = 91,949

643,643 / 11 = 58,513

643,643 / 13 = 49,511

darani
09-27-2008, 01:05 PM
A number with six repeating digits is always divisible by 3, 7, 11, and 13.

111,111 / 3 = 37,037

111,111 / 7 = 15,873

111,111 / 11 = 10,101

111,111 / 13 = 8,547

darani
09-27-2008, 01:06 PM
999,999 * 1 = 0,999,999
999,999 * 2 = 1,999,998
999,999 * 3 = 2,999,997
999,999 * 4 = 3,999,996
999,999 * 5 = 4,999,995
999,999 * 6 = 5,999,994
999,999 * 7 = 6,999,993
999,999 * 8 = 7,999,992
999,999 * 9 = 8,999,991
999,999 * 10 = 9,999,990

darani
09-27-2008, 01:08 PM
9 * 9 = 81
99 * 99 = 9,801
999 * 999 = 998,001
9,999 * 9,999 = 99,980,001
99,999 * 99,999 = 9,999,800,001
999,999 * 999,999 = 999,998,000,001
9,999,999 * 9,999,999 = 99,999,980,000,001

darani
09-27-2008, 01:09 PM
81,274,365 * 9 = 731,469,285
72,645,831 * 9 = 653,812,479
58,132,764 * 9 = 523,194,876
76,125,483 * 9 = 685,129,347

darani
09-27-2008, 01:11 PM
81 = (8 + 1)^2 = 9^2

^ -> means power

darani
09-27-2008, 01:12 PM
4,913 = (4 + 9 + 1 + 3)^3 = 17^3

^ -> means power

sunnyajmal
09-27-2008, 01:12 PM
thanks for the useful posts bro...

darani
09-27-2008, 01:15 PM
A small table of wonder for u all.....

http://i36.tinypic.com/b87ms0.jpg

darani
09-27-2008, 01:16 PM
135 = 1^1 + 3^2 + 5^3

175 = 1^1 + 7^2 + 5^3

518 = 5^1 + 1^2 + 8^3

598 = 5^1 + 9^2 + 8^3

darani
09-27-2008, 01:17 PM
1,306 = 1^1 + 3^2 + 0^3 + 6^4

1,676 = 1^1 + 6^2 + 7^3 + 6^4

2,427 = 2^1 + 4^2 + 2^3 + 7^4


^ -> means power

darani
09-27-2008, 01:18 PM
3,435 = 3^3 + 4^4 + 3^3 + 5^5

438,579,088 = 4^4 + 3^3 + 8^8 + 5^5 + 7^7 + 9^9 + 0^0 + 8^8 + 8^8

^ -> means power

darani
09-27-2008, 01:20 PM
Another amusing table for u....

http://i36.tinypic.com/282f0n.jpg

darani
09-27-2008, 01:22 PM
1 = 1!

2 = 2!

145 = 1! + 4! + 5!

40,585 = 4! + 0! + 5! + 8! + 5!

darani
09-27-2008, 01:24 PM
Amazing equality.......

http://i33.tinypic.com/2eusm6v.jpg

darani
09-27-2008, 01:27 PM
Find the output your friend got....

1. Choose any three-digit number (where the units and hundreds digits
are not the same).

2. Reverse the digits of this number you have selected.

3. Subtract the two numbers (naturally, the larger minus the smaller).

4. Once again, reverse the digits of this difference.

5. Now, add your last two numbers.

The output after this calculation will always be 1,089.....

Now start betting ur frnds.....

darani
09-27-2008, 01:28 PM
1,089 * 1 = 1,089
1,089 * 2 = 2,178
1,089 * 3 = 3,267
1,089 * 4 = 4,356
1,089 * 5 = 5,445
1,089 * 6 = 6,534
1,089 * 7 = 7,623
1,089 * 8 = 8,712
1,089 * 9 = 9,801

darani
09-27-2008, 01:29 PM
1,089 * 9 = 9,801

10,989 * 9 = 98,901

109,989 * 9 = 989,901

darani
09-27-2008, 01:32 PM
21,978 * 4 = 87,912
219,978 * 4 = 879,912
2,199,978 * 4 = 8,799,912
21,999,978 * 4 = 87,999,912
219,999,978 * 4 = 879,999,912
2,199,999,978 * 4 = 8,799,999,912

darani
09-27-2008, 01:38 PM
http://i33.tinypic.com/2uswi7l.jpg
http://i34.tinypic.com/2yosl21.jpg
http://i36.tinypic.com/2a5dxky.jpg

darani
09-27-2008, 01:41 PM
Friendly numbers

The proper divisors of 220 are 1, 2, 4, 5, 10, 11, 20, 22, 44, 55, and 110.
Their sum is 1+2+4+5+10+11+20+22+44+55+110 = 284.


The proper divisors of 284 are 1, 2, 4, 71, and 142, and their sum is
1 + 2 + 4 + 71 + 142 = 220.

C hw d frndship has been given between 220 and 284....

similarly



The sum of the proper factors of 17,296 is
1 + 2 + 4 + 8 + 16 + 23 + 46 + 47 + 92 + 94 + 184 + 188 + 368
+ 376 + 752 + 1,081 + 2,162 + 4,324 + 8,648 = 18,416

The sum of the proper factors of 18,416 is
1 + 2 + 4 + 8 + 16 + 1,151 + 2,302 + 4,604 + 9,208 = 17,296



Similarly u have many more like....
1,184 and 1,210
2,620 and 2,924
5,020 and 5,564
6,232 and 6,368
10,744 and 10,856
9,363,584 and 9,437,056
111,448,537,712 and 118,853,793,424

darani
09-27-2008, 01:45 PM
Square of friendly numbers....

6,205 = 38^2 + 69^2 and 3,869 = 62^2 + 05^2

5,965 = 77^2 + 06^2 and 7,706 = 59^2 + 65^2

^ -> means power....

darani
09-27-2008, 01:46 PM
Amazing palindrome numbers

11^1 = 11
11^2 = 121
11^3 = 1,331
11^4 = 14,641

always u can rely on powers of 11


interesting rite...........

darani
09-27-2008, 01:49 PM
Other way for attaining palindrome of numbers

23 + 32 = 55 .......... a palindrome

75 + 57 = 132 ......... 132 + 231 = 363 ........ a palindrome

86+68=154 ..... 154+451=605 ....... 605+506=1111 ....... a palindrome

darani
09-27-2008, 01:54 PM
Fun with Figurate Numbers


http://i33.tinypic.com/25rov8y.jpg

sunnyajmal
09-27-2008, 02:26 PM
nice...

darani
09-27-2008, 05:17 PM
thnx mate.....

darani
09-30-2008, 07:41 PM
anyone has important things like this?